+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 11, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence
On December 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor