+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4723
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On September 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor