+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- No further action taken
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2016 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in 222
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor