+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On October 13, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5351
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue