+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On September 8, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5218
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday March 25, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor