+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 22, 2019 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H3983
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor