+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on House Rules
On December 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On September 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government