+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On August 29, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5043
On December 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On December 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue