+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor