+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 29, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4935
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 10, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
- Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor