+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 25, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5148
On October 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On August 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
On October 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary