+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
On September 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsors (88)
Type:
Primary Sponsor