+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 8, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5028
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 4, 2020, pending concurrence
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor