+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service