+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied H2485
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 18, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor