+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On September 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
- Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor