+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On September 6, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5197
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor