+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4854
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 16, 2022, pending concurrence
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor