+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 255 of the Acts of 2022
On October 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 24, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On October 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On September 29, 2022 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On January 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 27, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor