+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 26, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H5085
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor