+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On October 13, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5201
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Health Care Financing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Elder Affairs