+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on House Rules
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor