+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4724
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor