+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On September 12, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5206
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 07/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor