+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On October 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor