+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On October 15, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5040
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 10, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday March 16, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor