+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 8, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5032
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
On October 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor