+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On August 13, 2020 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on House Rules
On July 15, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
On October 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor