+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 25, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5125
On July 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Higher Education
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Education
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor