+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4880
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
- Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor