+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On November 26, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor