+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On December 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
+ − Sponsors (93)
Type:
Primary Sponsor