+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in 428
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor