+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
+ − Sponsor
Tram T. Nguyen (By Request)
Type:
Primary Sponsor