+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 6, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
On October 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor