+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 2, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On August 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Public Health
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor