+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 29, 2021 in the House:
- New draft substituted, see H3999
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H3999
On July 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 28, 2021 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
On July 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Education
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor