+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On October 24, 2022 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On January 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 30, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor