+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4714
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Covid-19 and Emergency Preparedness and Management
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor