+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On September 15, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5222
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
- Accompanied by S1380
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On October 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor