+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor