+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in 222
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor