+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied S748
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On November 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor