+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Accompanied by S982
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor