+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On December 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On December 29, 2022 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On December 15, 2022 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On December 5, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On November 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On November 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On November 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure