+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4996
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2020 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Accepting Written Testimony
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
On April 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor