+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 29, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday October 27, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
On April 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor