+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On December 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 347 of the Acts of 2016
On December 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 19, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On December 19, 2016 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On December 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On October 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 6, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Transportation
On September 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor