+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 26, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Election Laws
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor