+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 175 of the Acts of 2016
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On July 28, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On July 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws
+ − Sponsor
Charles D. Baker
Type:
Primary Sponsor